UTTOXETER SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Uttoxeter Sports Club formation has not progressed further as yet. A Bank Account has not yet been created and no monies are yet generated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2015
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
- Shropshire
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 06 August 2014: CIO registration
- USC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richard Curtis - Middleton | Chair | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stuart Simon | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lee Carter | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clive Beardsley | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Michelle Andrews | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jason Ainsworth | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AS HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF VARIOUS SPORTS INCLUDING FOOTBALL AND CRICKET FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND ADJOINING COUNTIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 St. Catherines Close
UTTOXETER
ST14 8EF
- Phone:
- 01889563834
- Email:
- lee.carterurfc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window