Financial history PRODUCT OF A POSTCODE

Charity number: 1157899
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.25k £26.23k £21.35k £15.12k £2.47k
Total expenditure £5.37k £23.06k £22.11k £2.79k £17.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £11.82k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A