THE BIRMINGHAM THEATRE SCHOOL ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1160718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 June 2020 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 June 2020 710 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 June 2020 1075 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 September 2017 88 days late Download