Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN NETWORK ON STATELESSNESS

Charity number: 1158414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window