FLITWICK TOGETHER

Charity number: 1157451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £24.12k £7.40k £0 £41.05k £27.12k
Total expenditure £4.53k £2.86k £1.44k £8.38k £19.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k