Financial history THE CHIPPING NORTON AREA CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1158463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £22.91k £62.53k £19.83k £71.45k £135.22k
Total expenditure £25.68k £50.26k £50.97k £43.18k £75.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £2.00k £12.48k £14.32k