Financial history INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR KRISHNA CONSCIOUSNESS SOUTH LONDON LTD

Charity number: 1157355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £64.98k £38.01k £43.31k £39.58k £50.63k
Total expenditure £18.06k £17.87k £45.51k £29.76k £22.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A