NORTH BRISTOL FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157499
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 May 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 May 2019 118 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required