NORTH BRISTOL FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157499
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.24k £24.70k £127.89k £127.06k £252.50k
Total expenditure £28.84k £26.55k £111.74k £110.93k £171.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A