EACH:INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNICATION IN HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1159050
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £194.38k £158.73k £448.68k £185.29k £130.38k
Total expenditure £115.14k £164.24k £379.35k £224.32k £173.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A