EACH:INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNICATION IN HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 1159050
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marcy Rosenbaum Trustee 21 November 2014 None on record
Dr Richard Brown Trustee 21 November 2014 None on record
Professor Eva Maria Bitzer Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Professor Margarida Carvalho Figueiredo Ferreira Braga Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
Assistant Professor Michael Kaffman Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
Sandra Winterburn Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Lode Verreyen Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Dr Eva Doherty Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Dr Marlene Sator Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Dr Hilde Eide Trustee 21 November 2014 None on record
Maria Helena Brouwers Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
Dr Nicola Diviani Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Dr Sarah Francesca Maria Bigi Trustee 01 March 2019 None on record
Dr Maria Stubbe Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Professor Emanuela Mazza Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
Dr Maria Rosario Dago Elorza Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
Dr Arwen Helena Pieterse Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
Dr Conor Gilligan Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
DR Lorraine Noble Trustee 21 November 2014 None on record
Associate Professor Evelyn Van Weel-Baumgarten Trustee 21 November 2014 None on record