Accounts and annual returns HEART OF BIRMINGHAM VOCATIONAL COLLEGE LTD

Charity number: 1157785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 August 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 August 2020 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window