FOREVER ACTIVE FORUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1159692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download