FOREVER ACTIVE FORUM LIMITED

Charity number: 1159692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON HANNA Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
PENNY GRANGER Chair 06 November 2013 None on record
ANNE JOHNSON Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
Susan Margaret Dabner Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
DIANE ROSEMARY JOHNSTON Trustee 22 May 2012 None on record
Elizabeth Mary Crow Trustee 10 January 2019 None on record
DAVID JOHN WATKINSON Trustee 21 November 2014
City of Cambridge Symphony Orchestra Received: On time
SUE MORLEY Trustee 06 November 2013 None on record
Drs Stephania Wilhelmina Francisca Van Lieshout Trustee 23 July 2020 None on record
David McClean Trustee 19 November 2015 None on record