HOST NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1158704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.60k £15.17k £7.37k £21.12k £13.21k
Total expenditure £7.54k £13.87k £12.12k £12.76k £15.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.46k £5.00k £5.00k £4.25k