THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.42k £5.47k £11.03k £10.87k £6.91k
Total expenditure £6.56k £6.03k £10.45k £8.72k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.90k N/A N/A