FOOD IN SCHOOL HOLIDAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An umbrella charity addressing social justice issues. We are working in partnership with agencies providing projects that enable communities to provide food vouchers during the school holidays with our FISH project for children in poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 September 2014: CIO registration
- HMM (Working name)
- HOMEMATCHMAKER (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARDVA JEAN BOYES-BREWER | Chair | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Brandon-Snell | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE TRACY WABY | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283 | £0 | £2.42k | £30 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £0 | £0 | £5.48k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2023 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2023 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 15 SEP 2014 AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE HOMELESS BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lodge, 57 Lincoln Road
Branston
LINCOLN
Lincolnshire
LN4 1PD
- Phone:
- 07974729217
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window