RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL & EXTENDED SERVICES

Charity number: 1158113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £500.31k £586.26k £753.57k £749.56k £730.90k
Total expenditure £446.62k £557.00k £697.43k £769.52k £689.56k
Income from government contracts £224.43k £281.71k £487.92k £413.12k £435.59k
Income from government grants £0 £1.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £20 £0 £0 £236
Income - Other trading activities £3.99k £1.43k £134 £612 £551
Income - Charitable activities £496.32k £584.81k £753.15k £748.81k £729.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £288 £129 £167
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £443.36k £555.37k £697.43k £769.52k £689.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.26k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.25k £0 £0 £2.84k £3.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.64k £0 £0 £0