BEARE GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1157653
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 May 2021 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 May 2021 105 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 March 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 March 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time Download