BEARE GREEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1157653
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.46k £20.96k £31.24k £23.90k £26.60k
Total expenditure £16.10k £25.55k £36.12k £26.87k £21.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A