ABBEYFIELD COMMUNITY HERITAGE HUB

Charity number: 1158810
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 February 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2019 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2020 342 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2018 83 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 February 2018 391 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 April 2018 448 days late Download