Financial history WORLDREADER

Charity number: 1158030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £50.27k £277.37k £170.85k £89.23k £36.37k
Total expenditure £340.16k £93.20k £111.20k £155.48k £223.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A