FRIENDS OF HARPENDEN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1159562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 June 2017 On time Download