TON PENTRE AND DISTRICT RECREATION ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1157358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download