THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, WINDERMERE

Charity number: 1161992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANA MARY DODD Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
REV JAMES JOHNSTON RICHARDS Chair 13 March 2016
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON Received: On time
BOWNESS AND WINDERMERE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST Received: On time
WINDERMERE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK Received: On time
SCHOOL CHARITY OF JOHN BRAITHWAITE Received: On time
THOMAS COLLINSON Received: On time
MR MIKE FLETCHER Trustee 30 January 2011
THE SAMUEL AND FREDA PARKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK Received: On time
THOMAS COLLINSON Received: On time
ANN WANSKA Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
JILL BARBARA BUTLER Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
MARY FENNA Trustee 01 April 2012 None on record
William Martin Rayner Trustee 13 March 2016 None on record
JENNIFER ANN CARTWRIGHT Trustee 15 April 2011 None on record
TED COOK Trustee 14 March 2015 None on record
MIKE BALDWIN Trustee 01 April 1984
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK Received: On time
SCHOOL CHARITY OF JOHN BRAITHWAITE Received: On time
THOMAS COLLINSON Received: On time
Janet Anne Rudd Trustee 18 April 2021
THE AMBLESIDE AND DISTRICT U3A Received: On time