Financial history THE ROCK ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £35.49k £37.71k £33.87k £38.24k £23.14k
Total expenditure £33.97k £34.98k £35.23k £34.40k £22.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £1.55k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A