SAWSTON YOUTH DRAMA LTD

Charity number: 1159351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to advance education in all aspects of the performing arts by the provision of workshops and artistic performances. to help young people through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare. support and activities which develop their skills and capabilities to enable them to be mature and responsible individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £26,276
Total expenditure: £25,095

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SYD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARETH FURBANK Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
MARK ANTHONY LONG Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
STEPHEN KEITH WILLIAMS Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record
BEVERLEY DAWN FURBANK Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record
GARETH WYNN BONNER Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record
MEGHAN JANE BONNER Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record
ADAM JOHN BONNER Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £30.54k £1.64k £15.24k £25.72k £26.28k
Total expenditure £22.57k £3.36k £15.03k £22.73k £25.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 03 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
52 WAKELIN AVENUE
SAWSTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3DS
Phone:
07764344765
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available