Financial history AFRICAN DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1157822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £501.32k £608.20k £677.71k £833.27k £615.79k
Total expenditure £471.99k £515.72k £792.27k £670.93k £748.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £501.32k £0 £677.71k £833.27k £615.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £399.46k £476.34k £711.65k £602.18k £34.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.97k £11.85k £17.00k £10.39k £42.34k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.76k £2.99k £3.54k £5.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £708.65k £12.00k £23.79k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £38.56k £27.53k £63.62k £58.37k £671.44k