PERSONALISATION SUPPORT IN CAMDEN

Charity number: 1157537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £302.75k £292.43k £319.46k £338.02k £330.82k
Total expenditure £272.69k £289.09k £317.04k £341.45k £358.37k
Income from government contracts £254.36k £230.76k £193.70k £239.02k £248.51k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £18.00k N/A N/A