WEST HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1160370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time Download