WEST HILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1160370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Margaret Bromley Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
Patricia Joyce Fryer Trustee 16 March 2015 None on record
Peter Bennett Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
CHERYL BOULTON Trustee 26 September 2016
WEST HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MICHAEL BERNARD HARRIS Trustee 14 January 1999 None on record
Anthony William Fryer Trustee 21 September 2015 None on record
COLIN MICHAEL VEALE Chair 13 July 2015 None on record
Rev MAC DICK Trustee 16 July 2012 None on record
Therese Tarbuck Trustee 26 July 2021 None on record
Christopher Raymond John Hall Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
Patricia Anne Ratcliff Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record