Financial history FREEDOM FESTIVAL ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1158439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.15m £948.43k £915.34k £617.78k £915.39k
Total expenditure £1.20m £864.01k £934.83k £403.62k £786.55k
Income from government contracts £200.00k £200.00k £200.00k £200.00k N/A
Income from government grants £259.28k £267.00k £265.60k £288.04k £554.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £588.05k £188.40k £171.89k £53.99k £68.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £564.11k £760.03k £743.45k £563.79k £846.90k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £864.01k £934.83k £403.62k £786.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.57k £7.27k £12.90k £11.22k £2.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0