Trustees FREEDOM FESTIVAL ARTS TRUST
Charity number: 1158439

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Denby | Chair | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Dalby | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|||||
David James Keel | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Christopher | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL GRAHAM PORTEUS FCPFA | Trustee | 19 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Friend | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MEEHAN | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ANN AMA OKRA | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pritchard | Trustee | 04 October 2002 |
|
|||||
Garry Taylor | Trustee | 08 June 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.