COMMSORTIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1158524
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 June 2021 48 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 February 2021 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 25 February 2021 301 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 04 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 10 November 2016 On time Download