Trustees THE RUACH TRUST
Charity number: 1160242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Plackett-Ferguson | Chair | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Montgomery | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Tweats | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Clouting | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Manning | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CALUM RICHARD DYKE | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MISS RACHEL COCKRAM BSC | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.