AFC BARWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of health and social activities through the use of Association Football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £15,266 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 01 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Andrew Lane | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sydney Sheldon-Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul McCarty | Trustee | 23 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Ferrar | Trustee | 04 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.54k | £32.94k | £52.94k | £61.26k | £118.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.77k | £32.84k | £41.13k | £63.44k | £124.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | £15.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BARWELL AND THE SURROUNDS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AFC Barwell
Dovecote Way
Barwell
Leicestershire
LE9 8EX
- Phone:
- 07956 767130
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window