Financial history LONDON FESTIVAL OF BAROQUE MUSIC

Charity number: 1160689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 15/10/2021
Total gross income £152.69k £54.71k £7.65k £5.27k £300
Total expenditure £147.42k £70.36k £4.93k £304 £270
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A