Accounts and annual returns HEALTH & EDUCATION ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1158946
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2021 404 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 March 2021 404 days late Download Open in new window