Financial history HEALTH & EDUCATION ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1158946
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £147.26k £162.20k £782.49k £319.18k £346.23k
Total expenditure £154.76k £159.82k £185.85k £185.31k £223.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £38.72k £20.43k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £782.49k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £185.85k N/A N/A