WICKWAR YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1158267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download