WICKWAR YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1158267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.32k £14.40k £17.76k £19.25k £38.29k
Total expenditure £16.05k £13.80k £19.03k £19.32k £21.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.94k £10.00k £7.37k £8.00k £29.17k