CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE

Charity number: 1160021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 March 2018 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 March 2018 121 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time Download