LAINDON PARK PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 26 June 2014: Standard registration
- LAINDON PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIE SHEENA ANN AVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE FRANCIS SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1407 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1772 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1772 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 JUN 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAINDON PARK SCHOOL
CHURCH HILL
BASILDON
ESSEX
SS15 5SE
- Phone:
- 01268544808
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window