Trustees RICNIC

Charity number: 1158837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BEN CAHILL-NICHOLLS Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
Hannah Jane Lindsey Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Natalie Emma Haslam Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Eleanor Joy Macpherson Trustee 16 November 2020
None on record
Eleanor Felicity Cahill-Nicholls Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
Samuel Oladeinde Trustee 31 August 2016
None on record
NICHOLAS MORRIS Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record