Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD CITY KNIGHTS PROJECT
Charity number: 1158390
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (112 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
20 October 2023 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 October 2023 | 477 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 October 2023 | 477 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2023 | 842 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 October 2023 | 842 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 December 2022 | 902 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 December 2022 | 902 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 26 July 2019 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 26 July 2019 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window