Financial history NUNHEAD'S VOICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1164933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £74.72k £92.13k £95.17k £117.93k £107.01k
Total expenditure £78.39k £95.19k £103.02k £99.19k £146.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.60k £6.20k £6.29k £20.77k £22.67k