Trustees NUNHEAD'S VOICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1164933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca McGann Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Greg John Stump Trustee 08 January 2019
None on record
Dayon Raymond Haynes Trustee 10 September 2016
WESTMINSTER HOUSE YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
Julia Willis Trustee 27 June 2015
None on record
HEATHER SMITH Trustee 20 June 2013
None on record
HOWARD JULIAN FRANCIS Trustee 15 June 2011
None on record
CRIS CLARIDGE Trustee 22 August 2007
None on record