Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S HOUSE MANAGEMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1160924
Charity reporting is overdue by 1538 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 442 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 442 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 807 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 807 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1172 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1172 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 February 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1538 days