BRITISH GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 September 2016 On time Download