MOORLANDS HOME LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to relieve the needs of those persons residing in the area of operation who are socially isolated, elderly or mentally or physically disabled by the provision of support and assistance so that their quality of life may be improved. This objective is carried out by providing Day Care, Outreach Groups, One to One Befriending, Meals on Wheels and Transport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £93,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 26 August 2014: CIO registration
- 07 December 2018: Funds received from 1144688 BANK HOUSE DAY CENTRE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Savage | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Gowland | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Alkins | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Alison Cunningham | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £309.01k | £330.11k | £261.40k | £226.72k | £232.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.90k | £300.40k | £240.30k | £243.21k | £259.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £93.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 297 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2023 | 662 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2023 | 662 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PERSONS RESIDING IN THE AREA OF OPERATION WHO ARE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE SO THAT THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Black Horse House
4 Tape Street
Cheadle
STOKE-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
- Phone:
- 01538750511
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window